Hillard v. Lewien et al
Petitioner: Robert S. Hillard
Respondent: Mike Kinney, Barbara Lewien and Nebraska Dept. of Corrections
Case Number: 8:2014cv00310
Filed: October 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION - This matter is before the Court on Respondents Barbara Lewien's and Scott Frakes's unopposed Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 16 ). Respondents argue petitioner Robert S. Hillard's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 1 ) should be dismissed as moot because he is no longer incarcerated, having been mandatorily discharged from the Nebraska Department of Corrections on February 25, 2015. For the reasons set forth by respondents in their Brief in Suppor t of Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 18 ), the Court agrees that there is no existing case or controversy upon which this Court may grant relief. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition 1 , it is preliminarily determined that petitioner's claim is potentially cognizable in federal court. The clerk's office is directed to mail copies of this Memor andum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline for 3/12/15: deadline for respondents to file s tate court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 13, 2015:check for respondent's answer and separate brief. This matter will progress in the manner set forth above. Accordingly, petitioners Motion to Be Brought Before the Court 6 is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillard v. Lewien et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert S. Hillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barbara Lewien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nebraska Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?