Harris v. Lancaster Correctional Center
Plaintiff: Lawrence W. Harris
Defendant: Lancaster Correctional Center
Case Number: 8:2014cv00321
Filed: October 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff must update his address within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 27, 2015: check for address. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall have 30 days in which to file an amended complaint. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk's office is directed to se t a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 13, 2015: Check for amended complaint. The court will conduct further review of Plaintiffs amended complaint, should he file one, to determine whether summary dismissal of the amended complaint is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) and 1915A. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $7.38 within 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case may be dismissed. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collec t the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiffs institution. The clerks office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 1, 2014: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his cur rent address at all times, and all parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the court's Local Rules while this case is pending. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Lancaster Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence W. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?