Freeman v. Lancaster County Correctional facility et al
Plaintiff: |
Morris Freeman |
Defendant: |
Lancaster County Correctional facility and The Medical Provider Contracted by Lancaster County Correctional Facility |
Case Number: |
8:2014cv00326 |
Filed: |
October 23, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 2, 2015 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the court's initial partial filing fee, and for failure to comply with a court order. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
|
January 9, 2015 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff will have 30 days to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. In the absence of cause shown, this case will be dismissed without prejudice a nd without further notice. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 9, 2015: check for response to show cause order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 7 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $4.03 within 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and O rder, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff 9;s institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order t o the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 8, 2014: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff sha ll keep the court informed of his current address at all times, and all parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the court's Local Rules while this case is pending. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed)(TCL )
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Failure to comply as directed will result in dismissal of this case for want of pro secution. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 11/28/2014Check for MIFP or payment) Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with AO240 form)(MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?