Fraction v. James et al
Plaintiff: Bernard Fraction
Defendant: Randy James and Vandelay Investments
Case Number: 8:2014cv00348
Filed: November 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 13 Motion to Reopen Case. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT that this case is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons discussed in the Memorandum and Order 11 entered this date. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KMG)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff must update his address within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 30, 2015: check for address. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff will have 30 days to file an amended complaint that sets forth a short and plain statement of the grounds for the court's jurisdiction. The court reserves the right to conduct further review of Plaintiff' s claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) after Plaintiff addresses the matters set forth in this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: March 5, 2015: deadline for Plaintiff to amend. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER provisionally granting the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraction v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Fraction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandelay Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?