Battle et al v. Nebraska State Prison Medical Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Steven K. Battle, James Daisley and Jefferey Wehrman
Defendant: Dr. Ferguson, Kitchen Staff at N.S.P., Nebraska Dept. of Corrections, Nebraska State Prison Medical Dept. and Unit #6 in Official Capacity
Case Number: 8:2014cv00398
Filed: December 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: This action is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff must either submit an updated request to proceed in forma pauperis and poverty affidavit or tender the courts $400.00 filing and administrative fees within 30 days. Failure to ta ke either action will result in the court dismissing this action without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: February 2, 2015: deadline for payment or filing of IFP application. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with AO240 form)(TCL )
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Steven K. Battle shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $13.00 within 30 days from the date of this order, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 1/12/2015: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party; copy to institution)(ADB)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The non-lead PlaintiffsJames Daisley and Jefferey Wehrmanshall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order in which to advise the court whether he wishes to continue as a Plaintiff in this group action. If, by that deadline, any non-lead Plaintiff advises the Court that he does not wish to participate in the action, he will be dismissed from the lawsuit and will not be charged a filing fee for this action. This is the only way to av oid the obligation to pay a $350 filing fee for this action. Alternatively, if any Plaintiff (including lead Plaintiff Steven Battle) wants to pursue his claims individually in a separate lawsuit, he shall so advise the court in writing, an d his claims shall be severed into a new action where a filing fee will be assessed. Any non-lead Plaintiff who simply does not respond to this Memorandum and Order within 30 days will be obligated to pay the full filing fee and will also be dismis sed from this action for want of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Plaintiffs are again WARNED that future group motions or pleadings that do not comply with the group pleading requirements discussed herein shall be stricken pursuant to Rule 11(a). Plaintiffs are further ADVISED that each of them is under a continuing obligation to keep the court informed of any change in his address. The clerks office is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline in this matter: January 9, 2015: Check for responses from nonlead plaintiffs. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed to pro se parties)(TCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle et al v. Nebraska State Prison Medical Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven K. Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Daisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferey Wehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitchen Staff at N.S.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska State Prison Medical Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit #6 in Official Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?