Wetherell v. Kenney et al
Petitioner: Niccole A. Wetherell
Respondent: Michael Kenney and Denise Scrobecki
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2014cv00406
Filed: December 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - After considering Petitioner's financial status as show in the records of this court, leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Wetherell's petition is dismissed without prejudice to reassertion of a subsequent petition upon authorization by the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Respondents' 12 MOTION to Dismiss is granted. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claim is potentially cognizable in federal court. 2. The cler's office is directed to mail copie s of this Memorandum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to Respondents and the Nebraska AttorneyGeneral by regular first-class mail. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 4/27/2015: deadline for Respond ents to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment)l If Respondents elect to file a motion for summary judgment, the procedures set forth within the order shall be filed; If Respondents elect to file an answer, the p rocedures set forth within the order shall be filed. By April 27, 2015, Respondents must file all state court recordsthat are relevant to the cognizable claims. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 27, 2015: check for Respondents answer and separate brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Petitioner's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wetherell v. Kenney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Denise Scrobecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Niccole A. Wetherell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?