Wali v. Lindsay Corporation
Plaintiff: Makin S. Wali
Defendant: Lindsay Corporation
Case Number: 8:2014cv03087
Filed: April 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DISMISSAL that the Parties' Joint Stipulation and Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 39 ) is approved. The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 31 Joint Motion to Amend. The final pretrial conference is set for 3/25/2016 at 9:30 A.M., in chambers with Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. A jury trial before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp is set for the week of 4/19/2016, beginning at 8:30 A.M., in Courtroom 2, 2nd Floor of the Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines (filing 25 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion following a meet and confer conference between counsel to discuss the desired extension, including a discussion of proposed extension dates. If counsel can reach an agreement regarding this matter, they shall jointly submit a proposed progression schedule. The parties shall confer within seven (7) days of this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 18 the Joint Motion to Amend. The Deposition deadline is set for 6/19/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2015 at 9:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wali v. Lindsay Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Corporation
Represented By: Sarah J. Millsap
Represented By: JACKSON, LEWIS LAW FIRM - OMAHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makin S. Wali
Represented By: John P. Weis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?