Middlebrooks v. CenturyLink Communications et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Elaine Middlebrooks
Defendant: CenturyLink Communications and Qwest Communications
Case Number: 8:2015cv00001
Filed: January 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Filing No. 29 ) is approved. The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice. The Court will not assess attorney fees and costs. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER regarding Scheduling Letter 17 .1) The Rule 26 Meeting deadline is continued pending further order of the court.2) Plaintiff shall contact Defense counsel once she is out of the hospital. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter may proceed to service of process against CenturyLink Communications and Qwest Communications. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Middlebrooks a copy of the Complaint, a copy of this Memorandum and O rder, and two summons forms and two USM 285 Forms. If requested to do so in this matter, the United States Marshal will serve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Middlebrooks. In making such a request, Middlebrooks must complet e the USM 285 forms to be submitted to the clerk of the court with the completed summons forms. Without these documents, the United States Marshal will not serve process. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the clerk of the court will sign the summ ons forms and forward them to the Marshal for service on Defendants, together with a copy of the Complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: December 8, 2015: Check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party with documents as directed)(GJG)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's request for the appointment of counsel (Filing No. 8 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's request for a continuance (Filing No. 9 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 30 days that asserts plausible claims for relief as discussed in the court's Memorandum and Order dated April 7, 2015. Plaintiff must also file a copy of her right-to-sue notice or notices or amend her complaint to allege whether she f iled suit within 90 days of her receipt of any right-to-sue notices pertaining to her claims. Plaintiff's failure to act in accordance with this order will result in dismissal of this action. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: June 11, 2015: Check for amended complaint and notices. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 30 days that asserts plausible claims for relief under the ADA, ADEA, or FMLA. To the extent Plaintiff intended to allege something other than, or in addition to, claims under t he ADA, ADEA, or FMLA, she must so provide in her amended complaint. Plaintiff must also file a copy of her right-to-sue notice or notices. In the alternative, Plaintiff may amend her complaint to allege that she filed suit within 90 days of her receipt of any right-to-sue notices pertaining to her claims. Plaintiff's failure to act in accordance with this order will result in dismissal of this action. The clerk' s office is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: May 8, 2015: Check for amended complaint and notices. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in her case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of her claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middlebrooks v. CenturyLink Communications et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Elaine Middlebrooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?