United States of America v. Douglas, II et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Diana F. Carnahan, Denise K. Douglas, William Lee Douglas, II and Household Finance Corporation III
Case Number: 8:2015cv00057
Filed: February 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that the plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. This case is closed. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - The parties will inform the Court every 60 days, beginning on June 30, 2015, of the status of the debtors' bankruptcy proceedings. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a status report deadline of June 30, 2015. The Clerk of the Court shall provide notice of this order to the debtors through the counsel identified in their Suggestion in Bankruptcy (filing 13 ). Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - This case is stayed as to defendants William Lee Douglas II and Denise K. Douglas, pursuant to NEGenR 1.5(a)(1). The case may proceed as to defendants Household Finance Corporation III and Diana F. Carnahan. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Douglas, II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana F. Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise K. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lee Douglas, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household Finance Corporation III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert L. Homan
Represented By: Office of General Counsel USDA - Rural Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?