Johnson v. Experian Marketing Solutions
Plaintiff: Andrew Johnson
Defendant: Experian Marketing Solutions
Case Number: 8:2015cv00125
Filed: April 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER- Counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before October 6, 2015, they shall jointly file a Form 35 (Rule 26 (f)) Report, a copy of which can be found at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms in Word and WordPerfect format. 2) If one or mo re of the parties believes a planning conference is needed to complete the Rule 26(f) Report, or if the parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified or case progression issues raised in the Rule 26(f) Report, on or before September 29, 2015, a party shall contact my chambers at (402) 437-1670, or by email addressed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, to arrange a conference call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The Defendant's Motion to Life Stay 25 is granted. The stay of this case is lifted. The defendant shall file its answer or responsive motion, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a), on or before September 18, 2015. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the status report deadline of September 29, 2015. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Johnson's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction (filing 7 ) is denied without prejudice. Experian's Motion to Stay (filing 16 ) is granted. This case is stayed. Experian shall report to the Court every 60 days, beginning on or before July 28, 2015, on the progression and status of the Illinois proceedings. The Clerk of the Court shall set a status report deadline of July 28, 2015. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the defendant may respond to the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 7 on or before May 7, 2015 and the plaintiff may reply in support of his motion on or before May 18, 2015. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The parties shall confer and advise the Court, on or before April 24, 2015, whether they have agreed to a briefing schedule on the plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief. If the parties are unable to agree on a briefing schedule, each party shall file a statement of position, on or before April 24, 2015, setting forth a proposed briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on the defendant's Notice of Removal 1 and the plaintiff's state-court motion for a temporary restraining order and "temporary injunction" [1-2]. It is the Court's practice, for the sake of clarity and consistency, not to consider motions that are pending and undecided in the state court at the time of removal, unless and until a party refiles the motion in federal court in conformity with federal practice requirements. In particular, because the defendant has been notified of the action, any request from the plaintiff for preliminary injunctive relief should be filed in federal court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a). Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Experian Marketing Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Marketing Solutions
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Represented By: Kathryn A. Dittrick
Represented By: Robert W. Futhey
Represented By: David P. Kennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Johnson
Represented By: Allison D. Balus
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?