Valley Boys, Inc. v. Assurant, Inc.
Plaintiff: Valley Boys, Inc.
Defendant: Assurant, Inc. and Standard Guaranty Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2015cv00149
Filed: April 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that the plaintiff's Dismissal with Prejudice 33 should be granted. IT IS ORDERED that the above-entitled cause of action is therefore dismissed with prejudice, the complete record waived and each party to pay their own attorney fees and costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that on or before May 2, 2016, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon at Bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 30 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the Motion to Withdraw 28 is granted. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the appearances of Jessica Wilson and Justin Kornegay as counsel for Defendant and shall terminate future notices to them in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Boys, Inc. v. Assurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Guaranty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Boys, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Saathoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?