Peterson v. Kopf
Plaintiff: Randy S. Peterson
Defendant: Richard G. Kopf
Case Number: 8:2015cv00157
Filed: May 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Peterson's Objection (Filing No. 9 ) is overruled. Peterson's Motions for Status (Filing Nos. 11 , 12 , and 13 ) are denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This action is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Randy S. Peterson shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $4.86 within 30 days, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written mo tion. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following tex t: August 10, 2015: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiffs cla ims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed )(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Kopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Kopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy S. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?