Rivadeneira v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Felix Guzman Rivadeneira
Defendant: All the Warden of the Jail and Detention Centers contracted by I.C.E., Chief Operator of the Detention Operation Manual, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Immigration Customs Enforcement and United States Attorney General
CDFs: All the Contract Detention Facilities
IGSA: All the Intergovernmental Service Agreement Facilities
SPCs: All the Service Processing Centers
Case Number: 8:2015cv00218
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. All pending motions are denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiff will have 30 days to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. In the absence of cause shown, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/14/2015: check for response to show cause order) Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's later-filed Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP 7 is denied as moot. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $ ;167.81 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiffs institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner s et forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/10/2015: initial partial filing fee payment due.Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the in itial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiffs case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiffs claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivadeneira v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cdfs: All the Contract Detention Facilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Igsa: All the Intergovernmental Service Agreement Facilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Spcs: All the Service Processing Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All the Warden of the Jail and Detention Centers contracted by I.C.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Operator of the Detention Operation Manual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Immigration Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Felix Guzman Rivadeneira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?