Rasby et al v. Pillen
Plaintiff: Deborah Rasby and Douglas Rasby
Defendant: James D. Pillen
Case Number: 8:2015cv00226
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 THIRD AMENDED ORDER granting 130 Joint Motion to Amend Order setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (CCB) Modified on 8/1/2017 to reflect third amended order (CCB).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees for Motions to Compel (Filing No. 107 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: James Pillen's motion to compel production of documents, Filing No. 60 , is denied. James Pillen's objections, Filing No. 98 , are overruled. The order of the magistrate judge , Filing No. 81 , is adopted in its entirety. Rasby's motion to compel, Filing No. 77 , is granted in part. The order of the magistrate judge, Filing No. 89 , is adopted in its entirety. Pillen's objections, Filing No. 99 , are overruled. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AMENDED MEDIATION REFERENCE ORDER that the parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Mediator (Filing No. 94 ) is adopted. Except as may be otherwise agreed by the parties and counsel, this case is stayed for a period of 60 days from the date of this order, to permit the parties to utilize the private mediation services of: John C. Brownrigg, Esq.. During the period of the stay, unless otherwise agreed, compliance with deadlines established by the progression order, responses to discover y, pending motions, and other proceedings shall not be required. In the event the parties agree to proceed without a stay, a statement to that effect shall forthwith be submitted to the undersigned by plaintiff's counsel. On or before January 6, 2017, the plaintiff's counsel shall file a report on the status of the mediation and whether the case has been settled. Failure to so notify the court of the completion of the mediation, with or without settlement, may result in the dis missal of this case without further notice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Information about the substance of the parties' settlement agreement, if any, shall not be provided without their consent. Each party is required to designate one or more persons with full authority to settle the disputes between the parties, and such persons shall attend the mediation in person. The Clerk shall bring this file to the attention of the undersigned after sixty (60) days or when notified that the mediation has been completed, whichever first occurs. The Clerk is directed to provide a copy of this order to all counsel of record and unrepresented parties, and to the mediator identified above, enclosing with the latter the appropriate documents related to the administration of the Mediation Plan. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed as directed)(LAC)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting Deborah Rasby's Motion to Compel 77 , except the discovery sought shall be limited to the period ending December 31, 2013. James D. Pillen shall have until November 1, 2016, to supplement his discovery responses in accordance with this order. Deborah Rasby may issue a subpoena, consistent with this order, for responsive discovery not produced by him. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - The parties' Unopposed Joint Stipulated Motion to Amend Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case (Filing No. 84 ) is granted. Depositions due November 16, 2016. Jury Trial set for 4/24/17 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2017 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before assigned magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (LAC)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying 60 James D. Pillen's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (SMN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasby et al v. Pillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Pillen
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Rasby
Represented By: James D. Sherrets
Represented By: Robert S. Sherrets
Represented By: Diana J. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Rasby
Represented By: James D. Sherrets
Represented By: Robert S. Sherrets
Represented By: Diana J. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?