Crippen v. State of Nebraska et al
Petitioner: Jerrimie G. Crippen
Respondent: Scott Frakes, Robert Madsen and State of Nebraska
Case Number: 8:2015cv00238
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By November 9, 2015, Respondents mus t file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: November 9, 2015: deadline for Respondents to file state co urt records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 7, 2015:check for Respondents answer and separate brief. Peti tioner must voluntarily withdraw his habeas corpus petition within 30 days if he does not want this action to proceed as one brought solely pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. If Petitioner fails to respond to this order, the court will construe Petitioners petition as one solely filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed)(KLF)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in d ismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: August 10, 2015: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with AO 240 form)(TCL) Modified on 7/10/2015 to add form mailed as well(TCL ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crippen v. State of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerrimie G. Crippen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?