Long et al v. Long et al

Plaintiff: Dewayne Keith Long, Jr. and Holly L. Long
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 and Dewayne Keith Long, Sr.
Case Number: 8:2015cv00243
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs' complaint and all claims therein dismissed with prejudice for want of prosecution. A separate Judgment will be entered accordingly. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(GJG)
December 3, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1) Defendant's motion for additional time, (Filing No. 16 ), is granted. On or before February 1, 2016, Defendant DeWayne Keith Long shall file any motion to amend his pleadings, and shall answer or otherwise respond to P laintiffs' interrogatories, requests for admission, and requests for the production and inspection of relevant documents.2) The motion to withdraw filed by Law Offices Of Roger E. Naghash and Roger E. Naghash, as counsel of record for Plai ntiffs (Filing No. 21 ), is granted.3) On or before January 7, 2016, Plaintiffs shall either: (a) obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance in this case; or (b) file a statement notifying the court of thei r intent to litigate this case without the assistance of counsel. The failure to do so may result in a dismissal of the non-complying Plaintiff's claims without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed as directed)(JAB)
October 5, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The the defendant's objection (filing 11 ) is overruled. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
September 22, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's motion, (Filing No. 8 ), is denied on the merits. Defendant's motion, (Filing No. 9 ), is denied a moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
September 18, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - To the extent Plaintiffs seek a continuance, the motion, (Filing No. 6 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' motion to be relieved of their obligation to meet and confer with Defendant Dewayne Keith Long, Sr. is granted and the court will provide a Final Progression Order as set forth.- Deposition deadline is 12/30/2015. - Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2016 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long et al v. Long et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne Keith Long, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Keith Long, Jr.
Represented By: Roger E. Naghash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly L. Long
Represented By: Roger E. Naghash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?