Shoemaker et al v. General Electric Company
Plaintiff: Don Shoemaker and Yvonne Shoemaker
Defendant: General Electric Company
Case Number: 8:2015cv00275
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - On or before April 29, 2016, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal, or other dispositive stipulation, together with submitting to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the Court shall set a dismissal papers deadline of April 29, 2016. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: On or before December 18, 2015, the parties shall either filed a joint stipulation for dismissal of this case, or their Rule 26(f) Report for setting a progression schedule to trial.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Oral Motion. The deadline for filing the parties Rule 26(f) Report is extended to 10/30/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoemaker et al v. General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jeremy T. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Robert M. Slovek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Shoemaker
Represented By: Robert S. Lannin
Represented By: Ryan G. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Shoemaker
Represented By: Robert S. Lannin
Represented By: Ryan G. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?