Wanner v. Hormel Foods et al
Plaintiff: James Wanner
Defendant: Hormel Foods and United Food & Commercial Workers Local Union No. 293
Case Number: 8:2015cv00278
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 JUDGMENT - On the parties' joint Stipulation for Dismissal (filing 47 ), this action is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JAB)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, Plaintiff and Defendant Hormel shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court. Absent compliance with this order, any claims between Plaintiff and Defendant Hormel (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. This case remains pending as between Plaintiff and United Food & Commercial Workers Local Union No. 293. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. United Food & Commercial Workers Local Union No. 293's motion to dismiss 9 is granted. The plaintiff's intentional infliction of emotional distress claim is dismissed agai nst the Union. The plaintiff's breach of duty of fair representation claim is dismissed. The Court grants partial summary judgment for the Union with respect to the plaintiff's claim of breach of labor contract. The plaintiff's request for leave to amend his complaint to add two new state law claims is denied in part, and granted in part. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wanner v. Hormel Foods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormel Foods
Represented By: Rene L. Duckworth
Represented By: Kerri S. Reisdorff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Food & Commercial Workers Local Union No. 293
Represented By: Robert J. Henry
Represented By: Cara R. Sronce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wanner
Represented By: Raymond R. Aranza
Represented By: Jamie M. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?