Sabatka v. NRG Energy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gerard A. Sabatka
Defendant: NRG Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2015cv00310
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Extension of Trial and Other Case Progression Deadlines, (Filing No. 32 ), is granted. The progression deadlines are extended as follows: February 9, 2016 - Deadline for Defendant to disclose expert witnes ses and reports. March 13, 2017 - Deadline to complete written discovery. March 23, 2017 - Deadline to file motions to compel. April 17, 2017 - Deadline to complete depositions. May 17, 2017 - Deadline to file motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds. June 16, 2017 - Deadline to file motions to dismiss and motions for summary judgment. September 25, 2017 - Deadline to file motions in limine. The trial and pretrial conference are continued and will be re-set at the close of the settlement conference if this case is not resolved during that conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO FURTHER RESPOND that pursuant to the information provided by the parties during the conference, the Court orders that, by December 22, 2016: Plaintiff identify with specificity, preferably by Bates number, th e particular documents he asserts are responsive to each of NRG's Interrogatories and Requests for Production, if any, specifically including Interrogatories Nos. 3, 4, 6, 7 and 12, and Requests for Production Nos. 1-3, 6-7, 15-16, 20-27, 29 and 35-36. To the extent that no documents responsive to any particular Interrogatory or Request for Production exist or are within Plaintiff's possession, custody or control, Plaintiff update his responses to each Interrogatory or Request fo r Production to state as much. Plaintiff update his responses to Interrogatories Nos. 4 and 6 to identify any verbal or otherwise unwritten communications he recalls which are responsive to these Interrogatories, or to state that he has no recolle ction of any such verbal or otherwise unwritten communications responsive to Interrogatories Nos. 4 and 6. Plaintiff update his response to Interrogatory No. 12 to provide all responsive information regarding any alleged damages and facts substantiating the computation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that Defendant's motion to compel, (Filing No. 26 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 21 Defendant's Motion to Extend. - Depositions due 2/17/2017.- 4-day Jury Trial continued to 7/31/2017 at 9:00 AM before Judge John M. Gerrard. - Pretrial Conference continued to 7/18 /2017 at 9:00 AM by WebEx Conference before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx may be found at filing no. 12 .- Telephone Conference continued to 3/7/2017 at 2:00 PM with Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart to discuss the status of case progression and potential settlement. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 10/3/2016. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2017 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference s et for 3/21/2017 at 11:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx may be found at Filing No. 12. The parties proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List (s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on March 17, 2017. Telephone Conference set for 10/4/2016 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabatka v. NRG Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRG Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Kasey M. Cappellano
Represented By: Marcia A. Washkuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard A. Sabatka
Represented By: Raymond R. Aranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?