King v. Gage
Petitioner: Bud Lee King
Respondent: Brian Gage
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2015cv00346
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting the Petitioner's 20 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- This case is dismissed with prejudice and I will not issue a certificate of appealability I will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that upon initial review of the Petition (Filing No. 1), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims are potentially cognizable in federal court. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 5) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. The clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By March 2 5, 2016, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. If Respondent elects to file a motion for summary judgment, the parties must follow theprocedures outlined in this order. If Respondent elec ts to file an answer, the parties must follow the procedures outlined in this order. Petitioner's request to subpeona records is denied at this time (Filing No. 6). As set forth above, Respondent has been ordered to produce state court records that are relevant to Petitioner's claims. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(copies mailed as directed) (ADB)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court will conduct a preliminary review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bud Lee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?