Taylor-Womack v. Parrella
Plaintiff: Lecia Taylor-Womack
Defendant: Michael Parrella
Case Number: 8:2015cv00394
Filed: November 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Motion for Default Judgment (Filing No. 12 ) and Amended Motion for Default Judgment (Filing No. 13 ) are construed as motions for clerk's entry of default under Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) and are referred to the Clerk of Court. In the event the Clerk of Court enters a default against Defendant: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order as well as the entry of default to the addresses provided by the Plaintiff and listed below: Mic hael Parrella, 6 Union Avenue, North Providence, RI 02904 and Michael Parrella, c/o Coia & Lepore, Ltd.,The Arthur E. Coia Building, 226 South Main Street, Providence, RI 02903. The Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Motions for Default Judgm ent (Filing No. 12 and 13 ) within fourteen days after the Clerk of Court's entry of default. The Clerk of Court is directed not to terminate the Motions that appear at Filing Nos. 12 and 13, but to set a response deadline of fourteen days from the date of the entry of default. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Copies mailed as directed) (LAC)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Plaintiff's motion for hearing (Filing No. 10 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the clerk of the court is directed to send to Taylor-Womack a copy of the Complaint, a copy of this Memorandum and Order, and one summons form and one USM 285 Form for service on Michael Parrella. Federal Rule of Civil Proc edure 4(m) requires service of the complaint on a defendant within 120 days of filing the complaint. However, Taylor-Womack is granted, on the Courts own motion, an extension of time until 120 days from the date of this order to complete service of p rocess. If requested to do so in this matter, the United States Marshal will serve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Taylor-Womack. In making such a request, she must complete the USM 285 form to be submitted to the clerk of th e court with the completed summons form. Without these documents, the United States Marshal will not serve process. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the clerk of the court will sign the summons form and forward them to the United States Marshal for service on the defendant, together with a copy of the Complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: March 9, 2016: check for completion of service of process. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed to pro se party)(LAC)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in her case will be for the Court to conduct an initial review of her claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The Court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor-Womack v. Parrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Parrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lecia Taylor-Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?