Dishong v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Kristine M. Dishong
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2015cv00399
Filed: November 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) (filing 29 ) is granted. By separate document, the Court shall enter judgment for plaintiff and against defendant providing that plaintiff is aw arded attorney fees of $24,789.00. The defendant shall release the withheld amount of $16,519.00 to the plaintiff's counsel, and the plaintiff's counsel shall recover the mistakenly released sum of $8,270.00 directly from the plaintiff's minor child. The plaintiff's counsel is directed to refund the fee award of $8,889.87 to the plaintiff. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the memorandum and order entered this date, judgment is entered for the plaintiff and against the defendant providing that the plaintiff is awarded attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $8,889.87. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that the Commissioner's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (filing 18 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Clerk of the Court is directed to substitute Acting Commissioner of Social Security Nancy A. Berryhill as the defendant. The Commissioner's decision is reversed. This matter is remanded to the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for calculation and award of benefits. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dishong v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine M. Dishong
Represented By: Sean D. Cuddigan
Represented By: Timothy J. Cuddigan
Represented By: Philip S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?