Zurich American Insurance Company v. Andrew et al
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Bryce Andrew, Jane Andrew, Luke Andrew and Richard Andrew
Case Number: 8:2015cv00403
Filed: November 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Plaintiff Zurich American Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice (Filing No. 38 ) is granted. The above-captioned action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that Defendants' Objection to Notice of Subpoena 27 is sustained. Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Issuance of Subpoenas 29 is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - The Motion to Withdraw (filing 22 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall terminate James Boesen's appearance as counsel for Plaintiff and cease further notices to him in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Defendants Luke and Bryce Andrew's Motion for Trial in Lincoln, Nebraska (filing 9 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Andrew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce Andrew
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Andrew
Represented By: Adam J. Prochaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Andrew
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Andrew
Represented By: Adam J. Prochaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: James C. Boesen
Represented By: Albert M. Engles
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Represented By: Michael L. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?