Crittenden v. City of Omaha et al
Plaintiff: Deandre Crittenden
Defendant: City of Omaha and Paul Hasiak
Case Number: 8:2015cv00427
Filed: November 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss, see ECF No. 71 , is granted and the Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that the Plaintiff, Deandre Crittenden, and his lawyers and witnesses, are precluded, in limine, from making any direct or indirect reference to, or mention of, any complaints made against Defendant Paul Hasiak, not arising out of the facts of this case, including but not limited to the complaint and judgment in Case No. 8:11cv128. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Re: Trial Preparation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that the Joint Motion for an Extension of the Progression Order (Filing No. 41 ) is granted, in part. In lieu of the Final Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for July 17, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., a planning conference will be held with the as signed magistrate judge by telephone to discuss further progression of this case. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call with opposing counsel and the Court at (402)661-7410, at the time previously set aside for the Final Pretrial Conference. The Trial currently set to commence August 15, 2017, is canceled, and will be re-set by further order of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - The court therefore denies Defendants' request for attorney's fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Defendants' Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures (Filing No. 30 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall have until August 26, 2016, to serve his Rule 26(a)(1) mandatory disclosures on Defendants and to file certification of the service pursuant to NECivR 26.1. Plaintiff shall have until August 26, 2016, to show cause why sanctions, including the award of attorneys' fees under Rule 37 should not be imposed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 13 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $16.63 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a writte n motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The cl erk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 21, 2016: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed) (LAC)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing 8 ) will be denied without prejudice to reassertion following submission of a proper trust account statement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (filing 6 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crittenden v. City of Omaha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hasiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandre Crittenden
Represented By: William R. Harris
Represented By: Judith A. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?