Lewis v. BP Gas Station et al
Plaintiff: Johnette C. Lewis
Defendant: BP Gas Station, Bucks, Inc., Bucky's Express and Does 1-5
Case Number: 8:2015cv00439
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT that pursuant to the parties' joint Stipulation for Dismissal 30 , this matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - The parties' motion, (filing no. 28 ), is granted in part. The non-jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, United States District Judge, in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse , 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on June 26, 2017, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of one (1) trial day. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on June 13, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. Counsel shall use the conferenci ng instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference The parties' proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on Jun e 12, 2017. The deadline for completing written discovery under Rules 33 through 36 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is March 1, 2017. Motions to compel Rule 33 through 36 discovery must be filed by March 8, 2017Note: Motions to compel shall n ot be filed without first contacting the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge to set a conference for discussing the parties' dispute. The deposition deadline is May 1, 2017. The deadline for filing motions to dismiss and motions for sum mary judgment is March 14, 2017. The deadline for filing motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds is March 14, 2017. No further extensions will be granted absent a substantial showing of good cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - The non-jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, United States District Judge, in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on April 24 , 2017, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of one (1) trial day. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on April 11, 2017 at 1:00 p.m., and will be conducted by WebEx conferencing. A separate order will be filed with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference b y WebEx. The parties proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on April 7, 2017. The deadline for filing motions to dismiss and motions for summary judgment is December 29, 2016. The parties shall comply with all other deadlines that are not inconsistent with this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed with 3 summons and 285 forms)(JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. BP Gas Station et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Gas Station
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucky's Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnette C. Lewis
Represented By: Ross R. Pesek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?