Washington v. Brumbaugh & Quandahl, P.C., LLO. et al
Plaintiff: Tamerra F. Washington
Defendant: Kirk E. Brumbaugh, Brumbaugh & Quandahl, P.C., LLO. and Mark Quandahl
Case Number: 8:2015cv00444
Filed: December 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 JUDGMENT - On the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal (filing 130 ), this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own fees and costs. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - 1. Washington's motion for class certification (filing 74 ) is denied.2. B&Q's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (filing 77 ) is denied as moot.3. B&Q's motion for summary judgment (filing 96 ) is granted in part, and denied in part, as set forth above.4. Washington's motion for partial summary judgment (filing 100) is granted in part, and denied in part, as set forth above.5. B&Q's motion for contempt (filing 113 ) is denied.6. Washington shall show cause, on or before October 7, 2017, why summary judgment should not be entered as to her NCPA claims.7. The Clerk of the Court shall enter a show cause deadline of October 7, 2017.8. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for case progression as to Washington's remaining, unresolved claim against Quandahl.Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JAB)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER for CASE PROGRESSION - The Parties' Joint Motion for extension of time for the progression of this case and the trial of this matter is granted 83 . The current deadline for summary judgment motions by any party is extended from October 2 1, 2016 to December 15, 2016. Briefs in opposition to summary judgment are due January 5, 2017 and Briefs in reply to summary judgment are due January 12, 2017. The due date for Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dism iss 77 is moved from October 27, 2016 to November 9, 2016, and Defendants' Reply Brief is due November 23, 2016. The due date for Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification 74 is moved from Octobe r 27, 2016 to November 9, 2016, and Plaintiff's Reply Brief is due November 23, 2016. Trial of this matter is postponed and will be rescheduled by the Court. The Court will order a status conference within 20 days after the Court's ruling o n Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification to set a trial date. All other due dates and deadlines, including but not limited to the designation of expert witnesses, Rule 104 Motions, witness lists and other pretrial motions are postponed. These due dates and deadlines will be rescheduled in a subsequent status conference ordered by the Court within 20 days after the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CS)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that the Plaintiff's motion to extend deadline on motion forclass certification is denied as moot. Plaintiff's unopposed amended motion is granted. Plaintiff shall have until October 6, 2016, to file a motion for class certification, brief and index in support thereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' motion to modify and for reconsideration of the April 11, 2016, order is granted. Plaintiff's motion to amend is granted. Plaintiff's amended complaint and any exhibits and/or attachments thereto will remove any and all references to Birge v. Burmbaugh & Quandahl, P.C., LLO, Kirk E. Brumbaugh, Mark Quandahl, Sara E. Miller, and Midland Funding, LLC, 8:13CV8. Plaintiff is barred from seeking to discover matters involving Birge. Defendants' motion to quash notice to take deposition is denied as moot. Plaintiff shall have until September 22, 2016, to file her amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' motion to dismiss (Filing No. 19 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's motion to consolidate (Filing No. 22 ) is denied. Plaintiff's motion for citation of contempt (FilingNo. 25 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Brumbaugh & Quandahl, P.C., LLO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk E. Brumbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brumbaugh & Quandahl, P.C., LLO.
Represented By: David A. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Quandahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamerra F. Washington
Represented By: O. Randolph Bragg
Represented By: Pamela A. Car
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?