Denniston v. Conagra Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Denniston
Defendant: Conagra Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2015cv00463
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER TO DISMISS: The 56 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice is approved; The above-captioned action is dismissed, with prejudice; Any pending motions are terminated; and The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - This matter is before the Court on the Joint Motion to Continue Trial and Extend Deadlines. (Filing No. 47 .) The motion is granted. Dispositive motions shall be filed not later th an March 15, 2018. The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for September 28, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A four (4) day j ury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of October 22, 2018, in Omaha, Nebraska, before Senior United States District Court Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Unless otherwise ordered, jury selection shall be at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - This matter is before the Court on the Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. (Filing No. 40 .) The motion is granted. The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for May 9, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A four (4) day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of June 4, 2018, in Omaha, Nebraska, before Senior United States District Court Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Unless otherwise ordered, jury selection shall be at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - The Joint Motion for Stay of Progression Deadlines (Filing No. 31 ) is granted. This case is stayed pending the outcome of mediation. During this stay, compliance with the deadlines established by the progression order is not required. Within seven (7) days of the completion of the mediation, and in no event later than April 3, 2017, the parties shall file a joint report advising the Court as to the outcome of the mediation. In the event the mediation is unsuccessful, the parti es shall also submit a proposed amended progression order to the Court at bazis@ned.uscourts.gov. The clerk of court is directed to set a case management deadline in this case using the following text: "April 3, 2017 Mediation Status Report Due." Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (GJG)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for October 16, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in chambers, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18 th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Trial is set to commence, at the court's call, during the week of October 23, 2017, in Omaha, Nebraska, for three to four days, before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon and a jury. Unless otherwise ordered, jury selection shall be at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KLF)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 19 Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ZWA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denniston v. Conagra Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Kamron T.M. Hasan
Represented By: Henry L. Wiedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Denniston
Represented By: Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?