Lorenzen v. Taste Traditions of Omaha, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lorenzen
Defendant: Taste Traditions of Omaha, L.L.C.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00027
Filed: January 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the plaintiff's objection (filing 69 ) is overruled. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's motion, (Filing No. 58 ), is granted in part as stated above. A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on May 4, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss whether the trial needs to be re-scheduled to accommodate Dr. Bansal's attendance. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case, (see Filing No. 13 ), to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that the parties joint motion (Filing No. 43 ) is granted. Jury Trial set for 7/17/2017 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial C onference set for 7/5/2017 at 09:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER that the progression order amended is as follows: The deadline for completing written discovery under Rules 33 through 36 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is December 1, 2016. Motions to compel Rule 33 through 36 discovery must be filed by December 15, 2016 Note: Motions to compel shall not be filed without first contacting the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge to set a conference for discussing the parties' dispute. The deadlines for iden tifying and for complete expert disclosures for all expert witnesses expected to testify at the trial, (both retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)), and non-retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C)), are: For the plaintiff: November 15, 2016. For the defendant: January 16, 2017. For rebuttal experts: February 15, 2017. The deadline for filing motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds is March 1, 2017. The parties shall comply with all other ordered progression deadlines that are not inconsistent with this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER - Jury Trial set for 5/30/2017 at 09:00 AM in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2017 at 11:00 AM WebEx conferencing before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. The deposition deadline is March 2, 2017. The parties shall comply with all other deadlines recited in the final progression order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorenzen v. Taste Traditions of Omaha, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lorenzen
Represented By: Kelly K. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taste Traditions of Omaha, L.L.C.
Represented By: Lily A. Carr
Represented By: Susan K. Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?