White v. Coin Laundry et al
Defendant: Coin Laundry, Does 1-5 and Mayne Place, LLC.
Petitioner: Lelia White
Case Number: 8:2016cv00042
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12131 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT defendants' motion for attorney fees, Filing No. 95 , is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 89, is granted with respect to dismissal, but denied with respect to dismissal without prejudice; Defendant's oral motion to dismiss with prejudice is granted; and This action is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before July 28, 2017, attorney Jackie Barfield, shall pay the assessment or show cause by written affidavit why she cannot comply with the rules of this Court. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the Court removing Jackie Barfield as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, Filing No. 57 , is denied. Defendants' objection to attachments, Filing No. 62 , is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - The parties shall report to the court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before the close of business on August 18, 2016, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon them in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KLF)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - The defendants' motions to set aside default and for leave to file responsive pleadings (Filing Nos. 26 and 28 ) are granted. The Clerk of Court shall modify the docket to show that the entries of default are hereby set aside. The def endants shall have until June 29, 2016, to file answers or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint (Filing No. 1 ). The plaintiff's motions for entry of default judgment (Filing Nos. 24 and 25 ) are denied, as moot. The parties shall have until July 15, 2016, to meet, confer, and file a planning report as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KLF)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs 2 is granted; accordingly, the plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of the filing fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Coin Laundry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coin Laundry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayne Place, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lelia White
Represented By: Jackie L. Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?