Reddick Management Corp. et al v. Omaha, City of et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Reddick and Reddick Management Corp.
Defendant: Brook Bench, City of Omaha, Nebraska, Paul Kratz and Michelle Peters
Case Number: 8:2016cv00099
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER TO DESTROY - Counsel for the defendant notified the court on June 14, 2018 that the following exhibit held by the court in this matter can be destroyed. Defendant's Exhibit from motion hearing held on 3/23/2016. Pursuant NECivR 79.1(f) or NECrimR 55.1(g), if counsel fails to show cause why the exhibits should not be destroyed, the clerk's office is directed to destroy the above- listed exhibits 14 days from the date of this order.Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter should be, and the same hereby is, dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions (Filing No. 96 ) is granted. Defendant will be awarded the expenses and fees it incurred in attempting to obtain Plaintiffs' discovery responses. By April 3, 2018, Defendant shall subm it evidence of the expenses and fees it incurred in attempting to obtain Plaintiffs' discovery responses. Plaintiffs shall provide full and complete responses to Defendant's discovery requests no later than March 27, 2018. In the event timely and complete responses are not provided, the Court will consider the imposition of additional sanctions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Matthew D. Campbell is stricken as an attorney of record for Plaintiff. Said attorney may apply to be readmitted as an attorney of record only after paying the 2017/2018 attorney assessment fee, as required by NEGenR 1.7(h). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before July 27, 2017, attorney Matthew D. Campbell, shall pay the assessment or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the Court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the Court removing Matthew D. Campbell as counsel of record for the Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Filing No. 56 ) is granted. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint no later than June 28, 2017. Plaintiffs are reminded that the amended complaint may not include any previously dismissed claims, and may only name the City of Omaha as a defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER- THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: The joint motion to dismiss all of the plaintiffs' complaint against Paul Kratz, in his official capacity, Michelle Peters, in her individual and official capacities and Brook Bench, in his individual and official capacities, Filing No. 50 , is granted with prejudice, each party to bear its respective costs. The defendants' motion to dismiss, Filing No. 47 is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT defendants' motion to strike, Filing No. 32 , is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The plaintiffs' motions for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Filing Nos. 6 and 9 ) are denied. The defendant's objections to the plaintiffs' submissions (Filing No. 24 ) are overruled as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL) Modified on 4/22/2016 to change restriction per JFB chambers (TCL).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reddick Management Corp. et al v. Omaha, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brook Bench
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha, Nebraska
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kratz
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Peters
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Reddick
Represented By: Paul A. Banks
Represented By: Matthew D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reddick Management Corp.
Represented By: Paul A. Banks
Represented By: Matthew D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?