Hartmann Hay Company, LLC v. Wilbur-Ellis Company
Plaintiff: Hartmann Hay Company, LLC
Defendant: Wilbur-Ellis Company
Case Number: 8:2016cv00123
Filed: March 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED: The Report and Recommendation of Chief U.S. Bankruptcy Court Judge Thomas L. Saladino, Filing No. 54, is adopted in its entirety. The statutory reference of bankruptcy under 28 U.S.C. § 157 is withdrawn. The referral of this case to Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska is withdrawn. All proceedings in this matter are stayed until such time as the plaintiff or other appropriate party in interest obtains an order of the bankruptcy court authorizing the employment of the plaintiff's attorney to proceed with the litigation in district court. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER this case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska; This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska; The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall deliver the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FINAL PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - regarding (35) Motion to Extend in case 8:16-cv-00123-LES-FG3 and (35) Motion to Extend in case 8:16-cv-00125-LES-FG3. Depositions due April 3, 2017. Non-Jury Trial set for 7/2 5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2017 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Member Cases: 8:16-cv-00123-LES-FG3, 8:16-cv-00125-LES-FG3Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JLS, )
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Hartmann Hay case and the Wilbur-Ellis case are consolidated. The Hartmann Hay case is designated as the lead case with Hartmann Hay designated as the lead plaintiff. The Rule 26(f) report is amended as provided in Case No. 8:16CV123, Filing No. 27 at 3-4. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Before the court is the Notice of Related Case (Filing No. 4 ) filed by the Plaintiff in Case No. 8:16CV125. After a review of the matter, the court finds that the above cases are related as defined under NEGenR 1.4(a)(4)(C)(iii). Accordi ngly, Case No. 8:16CV125, Wilbur-Ellis Company v. Kent Hartmann, is reassigned to the undersigned for disposition and to Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartmann Hay Company, LLC v. Wilbur-Ellis Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartmann Hay Company, LLC
Represented By: BRAUER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur-Ellis Company
Represented By: James J. Niemeier
Represented By: J. Scott Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?