United Fire & Casualty Company v. Ventura Foods, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Sysco Corporation and Ventura Foods, LLC
Case Number: 8:2016cv00144
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF DISMISSAL that the Stipulation to Dismiss, ECF No. 52 , is approved. The above-captioned action is dismissed, with prejudice. Any pending motions are terminated. The Court will not assess costs or attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER AMENDING FINAL PROGRESSION SCHEDULE, granting 43 Motion to Continue. Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Jury Trial set for 4/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 the Motion to Amend the expert disclosure deadlines, as set out in this order. All other dates in the Court's Final Progression Order 29 remain the same. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Fire & Casualty Company v. Ventura Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Corporation
Represented By: Julie L. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura Foods, LLC
Represented By: Julie L. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Brian T. Bailey
Represented By: Thomas M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?