Beck v. Osmund
Plaintiff: Christopher Stephen Beck
Defendant: Sheriff Dan Osmund
Case Number: 8:2016cv00193
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 31 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 35 ) is denied as moot. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 27 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The clerk's office is directed to correct the records in this case to reflect that the sole defendants are Sheriff Dan Osmond and Pamela Goldsby. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims for deliberate indifference to serious medical needs for monetary damages against Defendants Dan Osmund and Pamela Hunter in their individual capacities may proceed to service of p rocess. Plaintiff's remaining claims against Defendants are dismissed for the reasons set forth in this Memorandum and Order. The clerk's office is directed to add Pamela Hunter as a defendant in this matter. For service of process on D efendants Dan Osmund and Pamela Hunter in their individual capacities, the clerk of the court is directed to complete 2 summons forms and 2 USM-285 forms and forward them together with a copy of the Amended Complaint (Filing No. 19) and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Marshals Service. The United States Marshal shall serve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: August 9, 2017: check for completion of service of process. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(copies and form to USM as directed) (ADB)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by April 9, 2017, that states a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is warned that his amended complaint will supersede, not supplement, his Complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: April 9, 2017: check for Amended Complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 4 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.50 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in respons e to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following tex t: January 6, 2017: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff&# 039;s claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall provide a certified statement as set forth above by November 25, 2016, unless an extension of time is granted in response to a written motion. The clerk of court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: November 25, 2016: trust account statement due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 2 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiff's request for summons (Filing No. 3 ) is denied. Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents (Filing No. 8 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Osmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Stephen Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Dan Osmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?