Merritt v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Bruce Merritt
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2016cv00196
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JUDGMENT - On the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal (filing 31 ), this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
July 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Continue. The deadline for filing motions to dismiss and motions for summary judgment is September 12, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the jury trial of this case is set to commence before Judge John M. Gerrard in Courtroom 1, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on January 8, 2018, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of 5 days. Jury selection wil l be held at the commencement of trial. A telephonic conference with Magistrate Judge Zwart will be held on September 12, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the status of case progression and potential settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MBM)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the parties' joint motion, (Filing No. 19 ), is granted, and the final progression order is amended as follows: Depositions due 10/31/17. Jury Trial set for 12/11/17 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Fed eral Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before District Judge John M. Gerrard. Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/17 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the final progression order is as follows: The jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, United States District Judge, in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on October 2, 2017, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of five (5) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for tr ial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on September 19, 2017 at 11:00 a.m., and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The deposition deadline is September 2, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merritt v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Merritt
Represented By: Donald F. D'Antuono
Represented By: Patrick S. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?