Quiles v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, Incorporated, et al

Plaintiff: Rodolfo A. Quiles
Defendant: Edward Adelman, Rodney N. Doerr, Kathleen Hughes, Tracy Scott and Union Pacific Railroad Company, Incorporated
Case Number: 8:2016cv00330
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 38:4301 Veterans' Reemployment Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2018 150 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The motion to quash by the United States, Filing No. 104, is granted; The objections of the plaintiff, Filing No. 134, are overruled; and The order of the magistrate judge, Filing No. 131, is affirmed and adopted in its entirety. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
April 20, 2018 149 Opinion or Order of the Court FOURTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Jury Trial set for 10/22/2018 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
March 9, 2018 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that the parties' motion for leave to offer additional evidentiary material regarding the objections to the magistrate judge's order, Filing Nos. 136 and 140 is granted and deemed filed instanter. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
February 6, 2018 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Third-Party Subpoenas (Filing No. 111 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
February 5, 2018 130 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Deposition Deadline - April 23, 2018. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2018 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
January 2, 2018 128 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 127 Joint Motion to Extend Progression Order Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2018 at 9:00 a.m. before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (SLP)
October 24, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - granting 107 Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for 6/4/2018 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
August 30, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Fees, Costs, and a Jury Instruction Associated with Disproving Defendants' Responses to Requests for Admissions (Filing No. 57 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
April 28, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, Filing No. 38 , is granted. Defendants' motion to compel arbitration and stay, Filing No. 43 , is denied. Plaintiff's motion to strike the reply brief, Filing No. 39 , is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
October 11, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 the defendants' Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration without prejudice to reassertion after limited discovery to be completed within sixty days; and granting 16 the defendants' Motion to File Reply Brief Out of Time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiles v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Adelman
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney N. Doerr
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Hughes
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Scott
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Scott P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo A. Quiles
Represented By: Jerrold R. Black
Represented By: Thomas G. Jarrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?