Continental Western Insurance Company v. Herbek Construction, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Continental Western Insurance Company
Defendant: Herbek & Bassett Construction, LLC and Herbek Construction, LLC
Case Number: 8:2016cv00353
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 71 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS, THEREFORE, CONSIDERED, ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, that the cause above-captioned be and the same hereby is dismissed, with prejudice to the bringing of a future action with each party to pay its own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 66 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Jury Trial set for 1/14/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order 61 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - This matter is before the Court on the Joint Motion of the parties to Extend Progression Deadlines. (Filing No. 60 .) All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by June 28, 2018. The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for November 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A seven (7) day Jury trial is set to commence, at the court's call, during the week of November 26, 2018 in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, United States District Judge. Unless otherwise ordered, jury selection shall be at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 48 ORDER - Jason G. Ausman is stricken as an attorney of record for Plaintiff. Said attorney may apply to be readmitted as an attorney of record only after paying the 2017/2018 attorney assessment fee, as required by NEGenR 1.7(h). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (GJG)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 47 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE regarding filing 46 Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for 6/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (GJG)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 45 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney Jason G. Ausman is to pay the biennial assessment. On or before July 27, 2017, attorney Jason G. Ausman, shall pay the assessment or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the Court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the Court removing Jason G. Ausman as counsel of record for the Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Western Insurance Company v. Herbek Construction, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Western Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason G. Ausman
Represented By: Brad W. Breslau
Represented By: Michelle D. Epstein
Represented By: Richard R. Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbek & Bassett Construction, LLC
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbek Construction, LLC
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?