Weis v. Triage Staffing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amy Weis
Defendant: Triage Staffing, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00356
Filed: July 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that the motion to withdraw filed by MaKenna J. Stoakes, as counsel of record for Plaintiff, (Filing No. 68 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that at the parties' request, all remaining discovery and case progression deadlines are stayed, and the pretrial conference and jury trial are continued pending further order of the court. Within ten (10) days after the summary judgmen t ruling, the parties shall contact the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers to discuss further case progression, including whether the parties will engage in alternative dispute resolution or intend to proceed to trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that the Final Progression Order is amended as follows: a) The deadline for the completion of written discovery is March 17, 2017. b) The deadline for filing motions to compel is March 31, 2017. c) The deposition deadline is May 22, 2017. d) T he deadline for filing Daubert motions is April 17, 2017. e) The deadline for filing motions for summary judgment or other dispositive motions is April 17, 2017. The dates for the pretrial conference and trial remain unchanged. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 28 Joint Motion and Stipulation for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (SLP)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER that the deadline for identifying expert witnesses expected to testify at the trial, (both retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)), and non-retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C)), is December 1, 2016. The deadline for complete expert disclosures for all experts expected to testify at trial, (both retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)), and non-retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C)), are: For the plaintiff(s): January 2, 2017. For the defendant(s): February 2, 2017. For plaintiff's rebuttal: March 2, 2017. The parties shall comply with all other deadlines recited in the Final Progression Order. (Filing No. 14 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weis v. Triage Staffing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triage Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Larry E. Welch, Jr.
Represented By: Damien J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Weis
Represented By: Bonnie M. Boryca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?