Wiemers v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Kurtis Todd Wiemers
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2016cv00413
Filed: August 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that upon review of the record as a whole, substantial evidence supports the ALJ's decision, and the government's motion to affirm the decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, (Filing No. 32 ), is granted. Judgment in accordance with this memorandum and order will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d), Nancy A. Berryhill is substituted for Carolyn W. Colvin as defendant in this suit. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that if the parties consent to final disposition of the case by the undersigned magistrate judge, on or before July 17, 2017, they shall complete the "CONSENT TO RANDOM ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE" located on the court's w ebsite at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. In the absence of timely submitting the attached form in accordance with paragraph (1) of this order, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Plaintiff's application, (Filing No. 6) is granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Memorandum and Order together with three summons form(s) and three USM-285 form( s) to Plaintiff's attorney of record for service of process on Defendant(s). If Plaintiff is not requesting service by United States Marshal, Plaintiff's attorney of record shall, as soon as possible, complete the summons form(s) and return them to the Clerk of the court to be issued. The issued summon(s) will then be returned to Plaintiff's attorney of record for service on Defendant(s). If Plaintiff is requesting service by the United States Marshal, Plaintiff's a ttorney of record shall, as soon as possible, complete the USM-285 form(s) and the summons form(s) and return them to the Clerk of the court. The Clerk of the court will sign the summons form(s), to be forwarded with a copy of Plaintiff's Com plaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. The Clerk of the court will copy the Complaint; Plaintiff's counsel need not do so. The Marshal shall serve the summons and the Complaint without payment of costs or fees. This order is ent ered without prejudice to the court later entering an order taxing costs in this case. No one, including any plaintiff, is relieved by this order from the obligation to pay or to reimburse taxable costs after this action is over. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed as directed)(GJG)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until February 21, 2017 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiemers v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurtis Todd Wiemers
Represented By: Roger D. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?