Colorado Security Consultants, LLC et al v. Signal 88 Franchise Group, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Colorado Security Consultants, LLC, Jared Iungerich and Timothy A. Siman
Defendant: Signal 88 Franchise Group, Inc and Signal 88, LLC
Case Number: 8:2016cv00439
Filed: September 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - Pursuant to the parties' joint Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) (filing 55 ), this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own fees and costs. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - The parties' motion, (Filing No. 41 ), is granted and the final progression order is amended as follows. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Signal 88's motion for preliminary injunction (filing 12 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 38 Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - The parties shall review the undersigned magistrate judge's practices posted at Civil Case Management Practices. Counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before December 1, 2016, they shall jointly file a Form 35 (Rule 26 (f)) Report, a copy of which can be found at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms in Word and WordPerfect format. If one or more of the parties believes a planning conference is needed to complete the Rule 26(f) Report, or if the parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified or case progression issues raised in the Rule 26(f) Report, on or before November 22, 2016 a party shall contact my chambers at (402) 437-1670, or by email addressed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, to arrange a conference call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Security Consultants, LLC et al v. Signal 88 Franchise Group, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Security Consultants, LLC
Represented By: Anthony L. Leffert
Represented By: Tim W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Iungerich
Represented By: Anthony L. Leffert
Represented By: Tim W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy A. Siman
Represented By: Anthony L. Leffert
Represented By: Tim W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal 88 Franchise Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal 88, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?