Borowiak IGA Foodliner, Inc. v. Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.

Plaintiff: Borowiak IGA Foodliner, Inc.
Defendant: Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.
Third Party Plaintiff: Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.
Third Party Defendant: Trevor Borowiak
Counter Defendant: Borowiak IGA Foodliner, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00466
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Pleadings in the Member Case (Filing No. 45 ) in Case No. 8:16cv465 is granted. Plaintiffs may file the Amended Complaint on or before June 2, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
January 17, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Borowiak IGA Foodliner, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate (Filing No. 23 in Case No. 8:16CV466) is granted, in part. To the extent that the motion to consolidate asks the cases be consolidated for trial, it is denied without prejudice to re assertion at a later date. The two above-captioned cases are consolidated for purposes of discovery and pretrial management only. Case No. 8:16CV466 will be designated as the "Lead Case" and Case No. 8:16CV465 will be designated as "Me mber Case." The court's CM/ECF System has the capacity for "spreading" text among the consolidated cases. If properly docketed, the documents filed in the Lead Case will automatically be filed in the Member Case. The parties are i nstructed to file documents related to discovery (except those described in paragraph 5) in the Lead Case and to select the option "yes" in response to the System's question whether to spread the text. The parties may not use the sprea d text feature to file complaints, amended complaints, and answers; to pay filing fees electronically using pay.gov; or to file items related to service of process. If a party believes an item in addition to those described in paragraph 4 should not be filed in all the consolidated cases, the party must move for permission to file the item in one or more member cases. The motion must be filed in all the consolidated cases using the spread text feature. The parties shall have until February 17, 2017, to meet, confer, and jointly file a report pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), encompassing both cases. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
January 5, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Borowiak IGA's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Rule 26(f) Report (Filing No. 25 in Case No. 8:16cv466) is granted. The Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline is canceled in case numbers 8:16cv465 and 8:16cv466. The court will reset the deadline upon resolution of the pending Motion to Consolidate. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KLF)
November 2, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Before the court is the Notice of Related Case (Filing No. 8 ) filed by the Plaintiff in Case No. 8:16CV466. After a review of the matter, the court finds that the above cases are related as defined under NEGenR 1.4(a)(4 )(c)(i). Accordingly, Case No. 8:16CV466, Borowiak IGA Foodliner, Inc., v. Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc, is reassigned to Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and to Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borowiak IGA Foodliner, Inc. v. Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T. Benedict
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Represented By: Kamron T.M. Hasan
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Represented By: John Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T. Benedict
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Represented By: Kamron T.M. Hasan
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Represented By: John Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T. Benedict
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Represented By: Kamron T.M. Hasan
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Represented By: John Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: Trevor Borowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Borowiak IGA Foodliner, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas B. Batter
Represented By: Bartholomew L. McLeay
Represented By: Suzanne M. Shehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Borowiak IGA Foodliner, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas B. Batter
Represented By: Bartholomew L. McLeay
Represented By: Suzanne M. Shehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?