Fastrich et al v. Continental General Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: John Fastrich and Universal Investment Services, Inc.
Defendant: American Financial Group, Inc., Cigna Corporation, Continental General Insurance Company and Great American Financial Resource, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00487
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER - The Joint Notice of Conditional Settlement and Motion to Stay Proceedings (Filing No. 73 ) is granted. All proceedings in this case are stayed pending final approval of the class action settlement in the Ohio action, Case No. 17-CV-00615-SJD . Within seven (7) days of obtaining final approval of the class action in the Ohio action, the parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) which will fully dispose of this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that the Joint Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery Pending the Outcome of the Parties' Scheduled Mediation (Filing No. 69 ) is granted. Discovery shall continue to be stayed pending the outcome of mediation. This stay shall include a tolling of all time regarding any and all outstanding discovery response period. This stay shall not include the issuance of third-party subpoenas. The parties shall advise the Court of the outcome of mediation on or before February 12, 2018. If mediation is unsuccessful, the parties shall contact the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers to schedule a status conference to discuss the status of the parties settlement negotiations and to further progress the case. The previously scheduled telephone planning conference set for January 19, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., is cancelled Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, ECF No. 35 , filed by Defendant Great American Financial Resource, Inc. ("GAFRI") is granted. GAFRI is dismissed from this action. The Clerk will remov e GAFRI from the caption. The Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, ECF No. 32 , filed by Defendants Continental General Insurance Company ("CGI") and GAFRI is granted, in part, as follows: a. Plaintiffs' claim for tor tious interference with a business relationship or expectancy is dismissed, with prejudice. b. The Motion is otherwise denied. The Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief, ECF No. 57 , is denied. Defendant CGI will respond to the remaining allegations in Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before September 5, 2017. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fastrich et al v. Continental General Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Financial Resource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fastrich
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Investment Services, Inc.
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?