Tremaine v. Goodwill Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ross F. Tremaine
Defendant: Goodwill Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00488
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 38 , filed by Defendant Goodwill Industries, Inc., is granted. This action is dismissed, with prejudice. A separate judgement will be entered. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER - That the Stipulation for Amended Protective Order and Amended Protective Order (Filing No. 34 ) is approved, and the parties' stipulated amended protective order is entered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - Motions to Dismiss and/or Motions for summary judgment shall be filed not later than February 14, 2018. See NECivR 56.1 and NECivR 7.1. All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by January 31, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER adopting 22 Joint Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (SMN)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 6 , is granted. The Plaintiff's Third Claim for Relief, based on alleged violations of the Nebraska Fair Employment Practices Act, is dismissed. The Defendant will respond to the remaining allegations in the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before February 13, 2017. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tremaine v. Goodwill Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross F. Tremaine
Represented By: Terry A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?