Langford v. Physicians Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Howard L. Langford
Defendant: Physicians Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2016cv00531
Filed: December 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to extend (Filing No. 11 ) is granted. If the case is not dismissed, the Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of the court's order addressing the potential dismissal of this case in which to serve the defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend. Plaintiffs deadline for responding to the Order to Show Cause, (Filing No. 7 ), is extended to February 7, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On or before January 24, 2017, the plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed as duplicative. The defendant's deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1), to answer or otherwise respond to the co mplaint in this case, is suspended pending further order of this Court. The plaintiff's failure to comply with this show cause order may result in dismissal of this case without further notice. The Clerk of the Court shall set a show cause deadline of January 24, 2017. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langford v. Physicians Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?