Meyer et al v. Currie Tech Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Marcie Meyer and Michael Meyer
Defendant: Accell North America, Inc. and Currie Tech Corp.
Case Number: 8:2016cv00542
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Counter-Designations of Deposition Testimony are sustained in part and granted in part as set forth in this Order. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part the motions in limine (Filing Nos. 154 , 155 , 156 , 157 , 158 , 159 , 160 , 161 , 162 , 163 , 164 , 165 , 166 , 167 , and 168 ) with several issues reserved for trial as set forth in this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER denying Joint Motion for the Production of Supplemental Juror Questionnaires (Filing No. 172 ). Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Currie Tech Corp. and Accell North America, Inc.'s objection to the magistrate judge's order (Filing No. 134 ) is denied. The magistrate judge's order (Filing No. 133 ) is affirmed. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Currie Tech Corp. and Accell North America, Inc.'s "Daubert Motion in Limine" (Filing No. 108 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER - that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave for Limited Deposition of a Previously Deposed Witness and a Limited Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (Filing No. 96 ) is granted. Plaintiffs may re-depose Mitch Robb and perform a supplemental Rule 30(b)(6) deposition as provided in Plaintiffs' Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Filing No. 98 -7). The depositions shall be completed by video conference and limited to one hour each. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER AND SECOND AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER - that Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadlines, Continue the Trial Date, and Leave to Amend Answer (Filing No. 71 ) is granted, in part. The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for February 13, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. An eight (8) day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of March 11, 2019, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., United States District Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER - Defendants shall supplement their response to Interrogatory No. 39(d) to state whether 16 C.F.R. § 1512 applies to the conversion kit at issue. Defendants shall also state who is responsible for determining whether that section applies t o the conversion kit and the basis for that individual's opinion as to the applicability of that section. Defendants shall supplement their response to Interrogatory No. 40 to identify their consumer complaint and conversion kit return process, who performed this process (dealt with consumer complaints and/or returns related to the conversion kits), whether any records exist regarding consumer complaints and/or returns, and what happened to conversion kits that were returned. Defendants shall supplement their response to Interrogatory No. 43. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - The Final Pretrial Conference with the assigned magistrate judge is set for December 14, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Co urthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. An eight (8) day jury trial is set to commence, at the Court's call, during the week of January 14, 2019, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, Jr., United States District Court. Unless otherwise ordered, jury selection shall be at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER - This matter is before the Court upon the Joint Motion for Protective Order. (Filing No. 41 .) Having considered the matter, the motion is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - In accordance with the findings made by the Court during the January 5, 2018 telephone conference, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery (Filing No. 23 ) is granted, in part, as stated herein. Counsel for the parties shall confer and to discuss a deposition schedule. Within fourteen days of this Order, the parties shall jointly submit a proposed case progression schedule to bazis@ned.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JAB)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Extend. The Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case (Filing No. 19 ) is modified as follows: 1. Plaintiffs' expert witness disclosure deadline is extended to January 5, 2018; 2. Defendants' exper t witness disclosure deadline is extended to March 2, 2018; 3. Plaintiffs' additional expert witness disclosure deadline is extended to March 30, 2018; and 4. The Deposition Deadline is extended to May 11, 2018. 5. The dates for Motions in Limine, the Final Pretrial Conference, and the Jury Trial are unchanged from the Court's Final Progression Order of June 13, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer et al v. Currie Tech Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accell North America, Inc.
Represented By: ENGLES, KETCHAM LAW FIRM
Represented By: Gregory F. Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currie Tech Corp.
Represented By: ENGLES, KETCHAM LAW FIRM
Represented By: Gregory F. Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcie Meyer
Represented By: Richard J. Dinsmore
Represented By: William Kvas
Represented By: Jayson D. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Meyer
Represented By: Richard J. Dinsmore
Represented By: William Kvas
Represented By: Jayson D. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?