The Edge in College Preparation, LLC v. Peterson's Nelnet, LLC
Plaintiff: The Edge in College Preparation, LLC
Defendant: Peterson's Nelnet, LLC
Case Number: 8:2016cv00559
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Edge in College Preparation's motion for partial summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Peterson's Nelnet's motion for summary judgment is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's motion to amend, (Filing No. 58 ), is granted. Plaintiff's amended complaint, a copy of which is attached to its motion, shall be filed on or before April 16, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - Plaintiff's reply brief on its motion to amend, (Filing No. 58 ), shall be filed on or before March 14, 2018. Any sur-reply shall be filed on or before March 21, 2018. For the reasons stated on the record, the trial and pretrial conference settings, and all unexpired case progression deadlines, are vacated pending further order of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER - Plaintiff's anticipated motion to amend the complaint shall be filed on or before January 26, 2018. Defendant's response shall be filed on or before February 6, 2018. No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER - Plaintiff's email motion, (filing no. 42 ), is granted. The status conference set for December 5, 2017 is cancelled. A telephonic conference is set for December 6, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. before the undersigned to discuss the status of case p rogression, potential settlement, and any potential discovery disputes. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the call. (See Filing No. 36 ). Counsel shall email a brief summary, no longer than 3 suc cinct paragraphs, describing the discovery disputes to chambers on or before December 5, 2017. The deadline for filing motions to compel is continued pending the outcome of the December 6, 2017 telephone conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ECP's unfair competition and UDTPA claims are dismissed. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for case progression. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Edge in College Preparation, LLC v. Peterson's Nelnet, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson's Nelnet, LLC
Represented By: Daniel F. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Edge in College Preparation, LLC
Represented By: Patrick S. Cooper
Represented By: Christopher O. Estwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?