Reckley v. NE Health & Human Services
Plaintiff: Patricia J. Reckley
Defendant: NE Health & Human Services
Case Number: 8:2017cv00017
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Filing No. 17 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Filing No. 12 ) is denied. Plaintiff's action is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff will have 30 days in which to file an Amended Complaint that states a claim upon which relief can be granted. Failure to file an Amended Complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismis sal of this action without further notice. The clerks office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: March 20, 2017: check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must update her address within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 27, 2017: check for address. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed and e-mailed to pro se party at preckley1975@gmail.com) (KLF)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in her case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of her claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reckley v. NE Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NE Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia J. Reckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?