Roohbakhsh, et al v. Board of Trustees of the Nebraska State Colleges. et al
Plaintiff: Nelson Larios and Lissette Larios Roohbakhsh
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Nebraska State Colleges and Chadron State College
Case Number: 8:2017cv00031
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' motion to exclude the testimony of Saundra K. Schuster (Filing No. 125 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order. Defendants' motion to exclude the testimony of Do nna Peters, Psy.D. (Filing No. 128 ) is denied. Plaintiffs' motion to exclude the testimony of Peter Lake (Filing No. 134 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiffs' motion to exclude t he testimony of Lisa Boesky, Ph.D. (Filing No. 137 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth in this Memorandum Opinion. Plaintiffs' motion to exclude the testimony of Karl Williams, M.D. (Filing No. 144 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 100 ) is denied. Defendants' motion for relief under FRCP 56(e) and NECivR 56(b)(1) (Filing No. 148 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER - that the Final Progression Order is amended as follows: The Final Pretrial Conference set for July 23, 2019, and the deadline for the parties to prepare and submit an Order thereto are Continued. The Jury Trial of t his case set to commence before Joseph F. Bataillon, United States District Judge, in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on August 12, 2019, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of ten (10) trial days is Continued. The Trial and Pretrial Conference dates will be reset after the Court rules on the pending Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER - Defendant's objection, (8:17CV31, Filing No. 70 ), is sustained. Plaintiff's motion for protective order, (8:17CV31, Filing No. 64 ), is denied. Plaintiff's motion for protective order, (8:17CV265, Filing No. 50 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER - that Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate, (Filing No. 60 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER - that a telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on June 5, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case, (see Filing No. 21 ), to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Motion to Extend. The final progression order (Filing No. 20) is amended as listed in the order. A status conference to discuss the status of case progression and trial and pretrial conference dates will be held with the unde rsigned magistrate judge on September 11, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The current trial and pretrial conference dates are vacated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB, )
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Protective Order.The parties shall note that Paragraph 7 of their proposed order was modified to reflect the options available using the court's electronic filing system. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roohbakhsh, et al v. Board of Trustees of the Nebraska State Colleges. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Nebraska State Colleges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadron State College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Larios
Represented By: Martin D. Gould
Represented By: Adele P. Kimmel
Represented By: Antonio M. Romanucci
Represented By: Christopher P. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lissette Larios Roohbakhsh
Represented By: Martin D. Gould
Represented By: Adele P. Kimmel
Represented By: Antonio M. Romanucci
Represented By: Christopher P. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?