Spring Meadow Farm of Johnston County, Inc. et al v. Agri Strategies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Spring Meadow Farm of Johnston County, Inc., Janet Stephenson and Whitley Stephenson
Defendant: Agri Strategies, Inc. and Jeffrey Carl Ramold
Third Party Plaintiff: Agri Strategies, Inc.
Third Party Defendant: John Hoberman, Hoberman Farms, L.L.C. and NGP, LLC
Case Number: 8:2017cv00054
Filed: February 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 114 Stipulation for Dismissal. All claims between Agri Strategies, Inc. and NGP, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. This case is dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL : Upon review of the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal, Filing No. 112 , the Court Dismisses with prejudice all claims between Third Party Defendant & Counter Plaintiff Hoberman Farms, LLC and Third-Party Plaintiff & Counter Defendant Agri Strategies, Inc, in the above styled action. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Filing No. 96 ) is granted. The firm of Gross & Welch and its attorneys of record shall be permitted to withdraw from their representation of Third Party Defendant, Hoberman Farms, LLC. Counsel shall i mmediately serve copies of this Order on Hoberman Farms, LLC, and thereafter file proof of service showing compliance with this Order, listing the names and addresses of the persons to whom notice was sent. Counsel will not be relieved of applicab le duties to the Court, their client, and opposing counsel until such proof of service is filed. Because Hoberman Farms, LLC, cannot litigate in this forum without representation by licensed counsel, Knoefler v. United Bank of Bismarck, 20 F.3d 34 7, 347-48 (8th Cir. 1994), within thirty days of receiving notice of this Order, Hoberman Farms, LLC, shall obtain the services of new counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on its behalf. If substitute counsel does not enter an appearance on behalf of Hoberman Farms, LLC, within thirty days of receiving notice of this Order, the Court may file an entry and/or judgment of default against it without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER that the Motion for Protective Order and Request for Expedited Relief (Filing No. 85 ) is granted. Mr. Vandenberg's deposition set for September 22, 2017, is canceled. The parties are to meet and confer to reschedule the deposition of Scott Vandenberg after the deposition of John Hoberman, and at least two days after Premier Pork Marketing, Inc., responds to Agri Strategies' outstanding document subpoena. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 81 Stipulation for Dismissal. Plaintiffs' Complaint [Filing No. 1] against Defendants Agri Strategies, Inc., and Jeffrey Carl Ramold is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys' fees. Agr i Strategies, Inc.'s claims against Third Party Defendants Hoberman Farms, L.L.C. or NGP, LLC [Filing No. 73] or any counterclaims asserted by the Third Party Defendants are unaffected by this Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Transfer Case and approving stipulation regarding 20 Motion to approve stipulation. 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is deemed withdrawn. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the District of Nebraska. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 2/22/2017. (Marsh, K) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 2/22/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spring Meadow Farm of Johnston County, Inc. et al v. Agri Strategies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: Agri Strategies, Inc.
Represented By: Martin P. Pelster
Represented By: David J. Skalka
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri Strategies, Inc.
Represented By: Martin P. Pelster
Represented By: David J. Skalka
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Carl Ramold
Represented By: Martin P. Pelster
Represented By: David J. Skalka
Represented By: Katherine Barber-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: John Hoberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: Hoberman Farms, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: NGP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spring Meadow Farm of Johnston County, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Represented By: ARMSTRONG LAW FIRM
Represented By: L. Lamar Armstrong, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Stephenson
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Represented By: ARMSTRONG LAW FIRM
Represented By: L. Lamar Armstrong, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitley Stephenson
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Represented By: ARMSTRONG LAW FIRM
Represented By: L. Lamar Armstrong, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?