Borovac v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Paul Borovac
Defendant: Ben Coleman, National Mediation Board, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Public Law Board 7680 and SMART, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers
Case Number: 8:2017cv00110
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151 Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED INITIAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 38 Motion to Extend Deadlines and Postpone Scheduling Conference. Planning Conference set for 03/05/2018 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Case conference instructions are found at Filing No. 33 . Trial is tentatively set for the month of September 2018, and is tentatively scheduled for 2 trial days. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (CS)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - Douglas Novotnys Motion to Withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff (Filing No. 36 ) is granted. Mr. Novotny shall immediately serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff and thereafter file proof of service showing compliance with this Order, listing the name and address of the person to whom notice was sent. Mr. Novotny will not be relieved of applicable duties to the Court, Plaintiff, and opposing counsel until proof of service is filed. Upon filing of proof of service pursuant to Paragraph 2 o f this Order, Plaintiff will be deemed to be proceeding pro se, that is, without the assistance of counsel, unless substitute counsel has entered a written appearance on his behalf. If substitute counsel has not entered a written appearance, P laintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court his current address and telephone number within five days of being served with this Order. Plaintiff may retain substitute counsel at any time. However, until such time as substitute counsel enter a written a ppearance, Plaintiff must comply with all case progression deadlines, orders of this Court, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of Practice. Failure to comply with these 2 requirements may result in the imposition of sanctions, including payment of costs, attorneys' fees, the entry of default judgment, and/or dismissal of the case. Mr. Novotny's submission of proof of service as described in Paragraph 2 of this Order, Mr. Novotny's appearance as counsel of record for Plaintiff shall be terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that Plaintiff Paul Borovac's Motion to Amend Complaint and Petition (Filing No. 13 ) is granted. Borovac shall file the proposed Amended Petition for Review and Complaint on or before August 1, 2017. Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 9 ) is denied as moot, without prejudice to its right to refile. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Petition for Review and Complaint on or before August 28, 2017. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borovac v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Borovac
Represented By: Douglas R. Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Mediation Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Law Board 7680
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMART, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?