Ross et al v. Bartle et al

Plaintiff: Ron Ross
Defendant: Americare Communities III, LLC, BVM Lakeshore, LLC, BVM Management, Inc., John Bartle, Rebecca Bartle, Bethany Village Apartments - New Castle, Inc., Bethany Village Apartments, Inc., Robert L. Rynard, Sr., Rynard Enterprises, Inc., Dane Starbuck and Dana Wadman-Huth
Creditor: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Debtor: Skyline Manor, Inc.
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 8:2017cv00119
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Robert V. Ginn is stricken as an attorney of record for Debtor. Said attorney may apply to be readmitted as an attorney of record only after paying the 2017/2018 attorney assessment fee, as required by NEGenR 1.7(h). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that on or before July 27, 2017, attorney Robert V. Ginn, shall pay the assessment or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the Court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the Court removing Robert V. Ginn as counsel of record for the Debtor. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The Motion to Withdraw (Filing No. 9 ) is granted. The planning conference scheduled in this matter for May 23, 2017 is hereby continued to July 19, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Findings and Recommendations of the bankruptcy judge (Filing No. 1 ) are adopted in their entirety. Reference of this case to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska is withdrawn. The magistrate judge shall progress the case. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross et al v. Bartle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americare Communities III, LLC
Represented By: Howard T. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BVM Lakeshore, LLC
Represented By: Howard T. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BVM Management, Inc.
Represented By: Howard T. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bartle
Represented By: Howard T. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Bartle
Represented By: Howard T. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Village Apartments - New Castle, Inc.
Represented By: Howard T. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Village Apartments, Inc.
Represented By: Howard T. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Rynard, Sr.
Represented By: Howard T. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rynard Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Howard T. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Starbuck
Represented By: Curtis J. Butcher
Represented By: Kathryn J. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Wadman-Huth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Francis J. Lawall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Ross
Represented By: Nicholas A. Buda
Represented By: Brandon R. Tomjack
Represented By: T. Randall Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Skyline Manor, Inc.
Represented By: Robert V. Ginn
Represented By: Patrick R. Turner
Represented By: T. Randall Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Patricia M. Fahey
Represented By: Jerry L. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?